OK SB654 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB654

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Sexual assault forensic collection kits; creating a task force to audit untested kits. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual assault forensic collection kits; creating a task force to audit untested kits. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Judiciary
2018-02-05HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections
2017-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-06SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2017-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-03-06SenateCoauthored by Senator Griffin
2017-02-21SenateCoauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author)
2017-02-16SenateReported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Floyd
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB654 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback