OK SB653 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB653
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Jurors; disqualifying certain persons from jury service. Effective date.
Title
Jurors; disqualifying certain persons from jury service. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom |
2021-03-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2021-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newhouse |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB653 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom