OK SB65 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB65
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Holidays; authorizing personal holiday leave for state employees. Effective date.
Title
Holidays; authorizing personal holiday leave for state employees. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanley |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB65 (Carry Over) 2023-03-01 - Title stricken