OK SB649 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Labor; prohibiting discharge of employee for certain conduct regarding wages. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor; prohibiting discharge of employee for certain conduct regarding wages. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseReferred to Rules
2019-04-08HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 14
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-21SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-21SenateCoauthored by Senator Bice
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Floyd
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback