OK SB646 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - CCR read, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - CCR read, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; creating the Accountability, Innovation and Privatization Act. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
State government; creating the Accountability, Innovation and Privatization Act. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Benge [R] | Sen. Randall Brogdon [R] | Sen. Glenn Coffee [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] |
Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 5 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2009-04-23 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 5 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2009-05-07 | Conference granted, HC's named Benge, Miller, Martin (Scott), Steele, Morgan, Dorman | |
2009-05-07 | SCs named GCCA | |
2009-05-06 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-04-27 | HAs read | |
2009-04-27 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 9 | |
2009-04-23 | Emergency added | |
2009-04-23 | Enacting clause restored | |
2009-04-23 | Title restored | |
2009-04-23 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2009-04-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson | |
2009-04-23 | General Order | |
2009-04-07 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-23 | Withdrawn from Government Modernization Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2009-03-11 | First Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-10 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 21 | |
2009-03-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 21 | |
2009-03-10 | coauthored by Jolley, Marlatt | |
2009-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-18 | coauthored by Benge (principal House author) | |
2009-02-18 | coauthored by Mazzei, Brogdon | |
2009-02-18 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-18 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Benge | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-12 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Brogdon | |
2009-02-09 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Mazzei | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Coffee | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 41 | 47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 4260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 450 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 450 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 450 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 450 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 450 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 450 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 450 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 450 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 450 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |