OK SB642 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB642
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 79-26)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 79-26)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial highway designations; designating the LCPL Trevor A. Roberts Memorial Highway. Effective Date.
Title
Memorial highway designations; designating the LCPL Trevor A. Roberts Memorial Highway. Effective Date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/17/2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2017-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Amended |
2017-04-20 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-04-20 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives |
2017-04-20 | House | General Order |
2017-04-03 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Holt, Simpson, Scott |
2017-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB642 (Carry Over) 2017-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 1698 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |