OK SB638 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB638
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy; modifying program for utilization of unused prescription drugs; providing for return of drugs to pharmacy for credit or reimbursement. Effective date.
Title
Pharmacy; modifying program for utilization of unused prescription drugs; providing for return of drugs to pharmacy for credit or reimbursement. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Garvin; authored by Senator McCortney |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Garvin |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB638 (Carry Over) 2021-02-23 - Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)