OK SB63 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB63
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers; authorizing a board of education to enter into written contracts with teachers for a certain number of years.
Title
Teachers; authorizing a board of education to enter into written contracts with teachers for a certain number of years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 15 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB63 (Carry Over) 2019-03-20 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee