OK SB624 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB624

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; modifying exempt vehicles. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; modifying exempt vehicles. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Aeronautics & Transportation Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-22SenateCoauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author)
2023-02-14SenateReported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
2023-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
2023-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Hall
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB624 (Carry Over) 2023-02-22 - Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author)

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback