OK SB622 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - Remove as author Senator Stanislawski; authored by Marlatt
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - Remove as author Senator Stanislawski; authored by Marlatt
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Turnpikes; modifying time period for revenue bond maturity. Effective date.
Title
Turnpikes; modifying time period for revenue bond maturity. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Stanislawski; authored by Marlatt |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |