OK SB615 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB615

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Fourth Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 36
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Game and fish; exempting the taking of feral swine from license requirement; allowing for headlighting. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game and fish; exempting the taking of feral swine from license requirement; allowing for headlighting. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 35 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseFourth Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 36
2018-05-03HouseCCR adopted
2018-04-10HouseCCR submitted
2018-04-10SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8
2018-04-10SenateCCR adopted
2018-04-10SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2017-05-25SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Pittman
2017-05-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2017-05-22SenateCCR read
2017-05-10HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on General Government Oversight and Accountability
2017-05-08SenateSCs named Dahm, Boggs, Brecheen, Kidd, Jech, Sparks, Bass
2017-05-02SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2017-05-01SenateHAs read
2017-05-01HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-27HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 6
2017-04-27HouseAmended
2017-04-27HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-13HouseTitle restored
2017-04-13HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
2017-04-13HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
2017-04-11HouseReferred to General Government Oversight and Accountability
2017-04-11HouseWithdrawn from Wildlife Committee
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Wildlife
2017-03-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-27SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2017-03-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-03-22SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
2017-03-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-02-28SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-28SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB615 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Remove as coauthor Senator Pittman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
26604New CodeSee Bill Text
26605Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
292138New CodeSee Bill Text
294135New CodeSee Bill Text
294165New CodeSee Bill Text
295203New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb615&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB615%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB615%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB615%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB615%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB615%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB615%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB615%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB615%20SFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB615_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB615_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB615_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB615_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback