OK SB614 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
Pending: House Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
Pending: House Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oil and gas; modifying interest payments on certain royalty payments. Effective date.
Title
Oil and gas; modifying interest payments on certain royalty payments. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2015-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crain |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |