OK SB609 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Vetoed 04/21/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Vetoed 04/21/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Workers' Compensation; modifying positions of the Court; requiring confirmation by the Senate. Effective date.
Title
Workers' Compensation; modifying positions of the Court; requiring confirmation by the Senate. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - House: R (Y: 40 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2009-03-23 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - House: R (Y: 40 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2009-03-23 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Vetoed 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Veto message read | |
2009-04-15 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-15 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-04-15 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-04-15 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-04-15 | Motion to reconsider vote tabled | |
2009-04-14 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Lamb | |
2009-04-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 22 | |
2009-04-14 | coauthored by Branan | |
2009-04-14 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-06 | HAs read | |
2009-04-06 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 34 | |
2009-04-02 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught, Derby, Ritze | |
2009-04-02 | General Order | |
2009-03-24 | Title restored | |
2009-03-24 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson | |
2009-03-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-03-11 | First Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 21 | |
2009-03-10 | coauthored by Mazzei, Jolley, Marlatt | |
2009-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-16 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2009-02-16 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Lamb | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |