OK SB606 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Executive branch appointments; requiring certain persons to be appointed by Governor. Codification. Effective date.
Title
Executive branch appointments; requiring certain persons to be appointed by Governor. Codification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-03-14 | First Reading | |
2011-03-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-10 | Motion to reconsider vote tabled | |
2011-03-09 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Russell | |
2011-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15 | |
2011-03-09 | remove as principal author Representative Wesselhoft and substitute with Representative Key | |
2011-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-07 | Pending removal principal author Representative Wesselhoft and replace with Representative Key | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Wesselhoft (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Russell | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 7302 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 4 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 2 | 201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 162 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 506 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 1 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 4007 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
72 | 63 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 166 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |