OK SB606 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB606
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ad valorem tax; deleting authorization to grant extension. Effective date.
Title
Ad valorem tax; deleting authorization to grant extension. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 5 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB606 (Carry Over) 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget