OK SB601 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB601
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax; interest accrual and due dates of certain reports or returns; emergency declaration; modifying period of underpayment for corporations. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Income tax; interest accrual and due dates of certain reports or returns; emergency declaration; modifying period of underpayment for corporations. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2021-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-22 | House | General Order |
2021-04-15 | House | Emergency added |
2021-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB601 (Carry Over) 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021