OK SB600 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB600
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Emergency clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Emergency clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School districts; requiring the division of certain school districts if approved at certain election. Effective date.
Title
School districts; requiring the division of certain school districts if approved at certain election. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB600 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee