OK SB6 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB6
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; creating the Sergeant Craig Johnson Act; definition of accessories. Emergency.
Title
Crimes and punishments; creating the Sergeant Craig Johnson Act; definition of accessories. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Darrell Weaver [R] | Rep. Ross Ford [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 17 |
2021-04-14 | House | General Order |
2021-04-06 | House | Emergency added |
2021-04-06 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard |
2021-04-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh) |
2021-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Remove Senator Rosino as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Weaver |
2021-03-31 | House | Remove as coauthor Senator(s) Weaver |
2021-03-31 | House | Remove Representative West (Josh) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Ford |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Weaver |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB6 (Carry Over) 2021-04-15 - HAs read