OK SB599 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB599
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Private education; modifying definitions; modifying standards of the Oklahoma Board of Private Vocational Schools. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Private education; modifying definitions; modifying standards of the Oklahoma Board of Private Vocational Schools. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB599 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author)