OK SB594 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB594
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; Oklahoma Milk and Milk Products Act; removing certain rule; expanding intent; providing an effective date.
Title
Agriculture; Oklahoma Milk and Milk Products Act; removing certain rule; expanding intent; providing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Darcy Jech [R] | Rep. Rhonda Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, RESTORE ENAC TING CLAUSE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, RESTORE ENAC TING CLAUSE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-04-18 | Senate | SCs added Fields |
2018-04-17 | Senate | SCs named Jech, Boggs, Kidd, Murdock, Dossett, Bass |
2018-04-12 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2018-02-26 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2017-04-26 | House | General Order |
2017-04-05 | House | Title restored |
2017-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2017-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jech |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB594 (Carry Over) 2017-04-27 - HAs read
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 7 | 404 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 7 | 413 | New Code | See Bill Text |