OK SB592 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB592

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; regulation of motor carriers; transferring divisions from Corporation Commission to the Department of Public Safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; regulation of motor carriers; transferring divisions from Corporation Commission to the Department of Public Safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseEnacting clause stricken
2017-04-19HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2017-03-27HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2017-03-22HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-22SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
2017-03-21SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-03-01SenateEmergency clause stricken
2017-03-01SenateTitle stricken
2017-03-01SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-02-28SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB592 (Carry Over) 2017-04-19 - Enacting clause stricken

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
471621New CodeSee Bill Text
471665New CodeSee Bill Text
471695New CodeSee Bill Text
471701New CodeSee Bill Text
471702New CodeSee Bill Text
471711New CodeSee Bill Text
471712New CodeSee Bill Text
471721New CodeSee Bill Text
471772New CodeSee Bill Text
471773New CodeSee Bill Text
4723022New CodeSee Bill Text
4723023New CodeSee Bill Text
4723024New CodeSee Bill Text
4723025New CodeSee Bill Text
4723026New CodeSee Bill Text
4723027New CodeSee Bill Text
4723028New CodeSee Bill Text
4723029New CodeSee Bill Text
4723030New CodeSee Bill Text
4723032New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback