OK SB591 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB591

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Vehicle weight and load; weight formula for permits; providing penalties for operating overweight vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle weight and load; weight formula for permits; providing penalties for operating overweight vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenateDied in conference
2017-05-10HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2017-05-08SenateSCs named Allen, Fry, Quinn, Simpson, Marlatt, Bass, Dossett
2017-05-01SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2017-05-01SenateHAs read
2017-05-01HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-27HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 4
2017-04-27HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-19HouseEnacting clause stricken
2017-04-19HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2017-03-29HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2017-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-21SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-20SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2017-03-20SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-03-01SenateEmergency clause stricken
2017-03-01SenateTitle stricken
2017-03-01SenateEmergency added
2017-03-01SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-02-28SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
2017-02-27SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-02-27SenateWithdrawn from Transportation committee
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB591 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Died in conference

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4714101New CodeSee Bill Text
4714109New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb591&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB591%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB591%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB591%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB591%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB591%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB591%20SFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB591_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB591_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback