OK SB582 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; relating to alternative teacher certification; providing for licensure and certification of individuals eligible through the Troops to Teachers and Passport to Teaching programs. Effective date.
Title
Schools; relating to alternative teacher certification; providing for licensure and certification of individuals eligible through the Troops to Teachers and Passport to Teaching programs. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Approved by Governor 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-16 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-04-15 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-04-15 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-04-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fields | |
2009-04-15 | General Order | |
2009-04-01 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Motion expired | |
2009-02-25 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure and emergency Jolley | |
2009-02-25 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 19 | |
2009-02-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 20 | |
2009-02-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-17 | coauthored by Jones (principal House author) | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-16 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-04 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Jones | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |