OK SB580 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons; directing certain pardon and parole procedures. Effective date.
Title
Prisons; directing certain pardon and parole procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (Jeannie) (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 332 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb580&Session=1500 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB580%20INT.PDF |