OK SB576 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB576
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School employees; directing certain report of abuse or neglect to be made to DHS and law enforcement; requiring allegations reported to county office be referred to Department hotline. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
School employees; directing certain report of abuse or neglect to be made to DHS and law enforcement; requiring allegations reported to county office be referred to Department hotline. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/16/2019 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Ikley-Freeman |
2019-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 6 |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended |
2019-04-26 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-04-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Branham |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered |
2019-04-24 | House | Laid over |
2019-04-24 | House | Amended |
2019-04-24 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-04-24 | House | General Order |
2019-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Conley (principal House author) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kidd |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB576 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019