OK SB576 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School employees; directing certain report of abuse or neglect to be made to DHS and law enforcement; requiring allegations reported to county office be referred to Department hotline. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School employees; directing certain report of abuse or neglect to be made to DHS and law enforcement; requiring allegations reported to county office be referred to Department hotline. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateApproved by Governor 05/16/2019
2019-05-13SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-13HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-13SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-09SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-09SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-05-09SenateHAs adopted
2019-05-07SenateCoauthored by Senator Ikley-Freeman
2019-04-29SenateHAs read
2019-04-29HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 6
2019-04-25HouseAmended
2019-04-26HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-25HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Branham
2019-04-25HouseConsidered
2019-04-24HouseLaid over
2019-04-24HouseAmended
2019-04-24HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Conley (principal House author)
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Kidd
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb576&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB576%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB576%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB576%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB576%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB576%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB576%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB576%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB576_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB576_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback