OK SB572 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Coauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Immigration and customs laws; Attorney General enforcement of federal immigration and customs laws; requiring Attorney General to make certain determination upon request. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immigration and customs laws; Attorney General enforcement of federal immigration and customs laws; requiring Attorney General to make certain determination upon request. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author)
2021-02-04SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback