OK SB568 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB568
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Water Resources Board; creating revolving fund to implement Arbuckle-Simpson hydrology study. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Water Resources Board; creating revolving fund to implement Arbuckle-Simpson hydrology study. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: E DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: E DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | General Order |
2019-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services sub-committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kidd |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB568 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019