OK SB564 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB564
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; livestock diseases; authorizing the State Veterinarian to issue stop movement orders. Effective date.
Title
Agriculture; livestock diseases; authorizing the State Veterinarian to issue stop movement orders. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 3 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) (principal House author) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Howard |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB564 (Carry Over) 2019-04-01 - CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee