OK SB563 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB563

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Public buildings and public works; establishing certain purchasing provisions for school districts. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public buildings and public works; establishing certain purchasing provisions for school districts. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateApproved by Governor 05/12/2017
2017-05-08SenateSent to Governor
2017-05-08HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-05-08SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-05-04SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-05-04SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
2017-05-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-05-04SenateHAs adopted
2017-04-26SenateHAs read
2017-04-26HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 3
2017-04-25HouseAmended
2017-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-11HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Loveless
2017-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2017-04-03HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2017-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-21SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-20SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
2017-03-20SenateTitle restored
2017-03-20SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-27SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
2017-02-08Senatecoauthored by Murphey (principal House author)
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB563 (Carry Over) 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb563&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB563%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB563%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB563%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB563%20ENR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB563%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB563%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB563%20HFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB563_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB563_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback