OK SB563 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB563
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public buildings and public works; establishing certain purchasing provisions for school districts. Effective date.
Title
Public buildings and public works; establishing certain purchasing provisions for school districts. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/12/2017 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Brecheen |
2017-05-04 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 3 |
2017-04-25 | House | Amended |
2017-04-25 | House | General Order |
2017-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Loveless |
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Murphey (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB563 (Carry Over) 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017