OK SB563 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Veto message read
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Veto message read
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Roads and bridges; relating to use of right-of-way by public utilities; modifying definition of certain terms. Effective date.
Title
Roads and bridges; relating to use of right-of-way by public utilities; modifying definition of certain terms. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. David Derby [R] | Sen. Jason Smalley [R] | Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Jerry McPeak [D] |
Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Rep. Tom Newell [R] |
Rep. Justin Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House: Transportation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House: Transportation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | Senate | Veto message read |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Vetoed 04/17/2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 15 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Crain; authored by Smalley |
2015-03-31 | Senate | coauthored by Wesselhoft, Wood |
2015-03-31 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-03-31 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-30 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-30 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 13 |
2015-03-30 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft, Billy, McPeak |
2015-03-30 | House | General Order |
2015-03-24 | House | Title restored |
2015-03-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Newell, Kirby |
2015-03-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 13 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-09 | Senate | coauthored by Derby (principal House author) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crain |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |