OK SB563 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Health Insurance High Risk Pool Act; modifying definitions and determination of certain rate.
Title
Health Insurance High Risk Pool Act; modifying definitions and determination of certain rate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 52 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Approved by Governor 05/06/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-02 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-27 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 4; Ayes: 52 Nays: 30 | |
2011-04-26 | General Order | |
2011-04-07 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-14 | First Reading | |
2011-03-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-10 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Mulready (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Brown | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 6532 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6542 | New Code | See Bill Text |