OK SB562 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB562
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public buildings and public works; exempting state agencies and schools from certain services. Effective date.
Title
Public buildings and public works; exempting state agencies and schools from certain services. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Murphey |
2017-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB562 (Carry Over) 2017-02-20 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed