OK SB560 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Self-defense; prohibiting certain prosecution for offense. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Self-defense; prohibiting certain prosecution for offense. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
2021-03-09HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-09SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-08SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-08SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8
2021-03-08SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-02SenateCoauthored by Senator Hamilton
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Rick) (principal House author)
2021-02-08SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2021-02-08SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb560&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB560%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB560%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB560%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB560%20HFLR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB560%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB560%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB560_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB560_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback