OK SB560 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB560

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Remove as coauthor Senator Shortey
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; creating the Parent Empowerment, Revenue Enhancement and Classroom Size Reduction Act. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; creating the Parent Empowerment, Revenue Enhancement and Classroom Size Reduction Act. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-15SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Shortey
2017-03-02SenateCoauthored by Senator Shortey
2017-03-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-02-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Daniels
2017-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Newhouse
2017-02-20SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-02-20SenateEmergency clause stricken
2017-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-20SenateReported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2017-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Loveless
2017-02-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Yen
2017-02-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB560 (Carry Over) 2017-03-15 - Remove as coauthor Senator Shortey

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7028101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7028102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7028103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7028104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7028105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7028106Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback