OK SB56 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; deleting certain requirements from application. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; deleting certain requirements from application. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28SenateApproved by Governor 04/28/2015
2015-04-22SenateSent to Governor
2015-04-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-04-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-04-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-04-21HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-04-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1
2015-04-21HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Faught
2015-04-21HouseGeneral Order
2015-04-09HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Sharp
2015-04-09HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2015-03-10HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-02SenateEngrossed to House
2015-02-26SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-02-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2015-02-26SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-02-12Senatecoauthored by Brecheen
2015-02-12SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2015-02-05Senatecoauthored by Vaughan (principal House author)
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21129018New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback