OK SB550 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB550
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurance; requiring insurer to provide specific reason for denial of claims; authorizing certain persons to submit written appeal after denial. Effective date.
Title
Health insurance; requiring insurer to provide specific reason for denial of claims; authorizing certain persons to submit written appeal after denial. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Newhouse [R] | Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Rep. Marcus McEntire [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
Rep. Logan Phillips [R] | Rep. Melissa Provenzano [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/23/2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3 |
2021-04-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano, Phillips |
2021-04-19 | House | General Order |
2021-04-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire, Davis |
2021-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Remove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Pae |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2021-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newhouse |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB550 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021