OK SB547 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB547

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-04 - CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans; establishing duty of Attorney General to represent and protect veterans in the enforcement of federal benefits. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans; establishing duty of Attorney General to represent and protect veterans in the enforcement of federal benefits. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-04 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans & Military Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans & Military Affairs Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Veterans & Military Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-04HouseCR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
2023-03-29HouseSecond Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
2023-03-22HouseFirst Reading
2023-03-22SenateEngrossed to House
2023-03-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-03-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2023-03-21SenateTitle restored
2023-03-21SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2023-02-22SenateTitle stricken
2023-02-22SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2023-02-21SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
2023-02-15SenateReferred to Appropriations
2023-02-15SenateReported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
2023-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2023-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Pugh
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB547 (Carry Over) 2023-04-04 - CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb547&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB547%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/SB547%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB547%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/SB547%20HFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB547%20(3-20-23)%20(PUGH)%20FS%20FA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB547%20(3-20-23)%20(PUGH)%20RT%20FA2.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB547%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB547%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB547%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB547_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB547_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback