OK SB543 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB543
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; modifying definition of feral swine. Effective date.
Title
Agriculture; modifying definition of feral swine. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 2 |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended |
2019-04-25 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-04-25 | House | General Order |
2019-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Murdock; authored by Senator Pederson |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Murdock |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB543 (Carry Over) 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019