OK SB540 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB540
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department; removing restriction for use of revolving fund. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department; removing restriction for use of revolving fund. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton |
2019-03-28 | House | Remove Representative Newton as principal House author and substitute with Representative Phillips |
2019-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-02-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services sub-committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jech |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB540 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton