OK SB54 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB54
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Small estate administration; authorizing entities to release property upon receipt of affidavit; adding property required to be paid or delivered upon receipt of affidavit. Effective date.
Title
Small estate administration; authorizing entities to release property upon receipt of affidavit; adding property required to be paid or delivered upon receipt of affidavit. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2023-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Howard |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB54 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee