OK SB539 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB539

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance licensure; modifying requirements for continuing education courses; requiring licensee to maintain updated information with the Insurance Commissioner. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance licensure; modifying requirements for continuing education courses; requiring licensee to maintain updated information with the Insurance Commissioner. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement & Insurance Senate Bill: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-02SenateApproved by Governor 05/02/2023
2023-04-26SenateSent to Governor
2023-04-26HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2023-04-26SenateEnrolled, to House
2023-04-25SenateReferred for enrollment
2023-04-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2023-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
2023-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2023-04-04HouseCR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
2023-03-29HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2023-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-14SenateEngrossed to House
2023-02-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-02-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2023-02-13SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2023-02-07SenateReported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2023-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2023-02-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author)
2023-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Montgomery
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB539 (Carry Over) 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb539&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB539%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/SB539%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB539%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/SB539%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/SB/SB539%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB539%20CA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB539%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/SB539%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB539%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB539_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB539_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback