OK SB532 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; authorizing certain vehicles to operate on state roads or highways. Codification.
Title
Motor vehicles; authorizing certain vehicles to operate on state roads or highways. Codification.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Approved by Governor 05/06/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-02 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-27 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0; Ayes: 49 Nays: 25 | |
2011-04-26 | General Order | |
2011-03-30 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-03-10 | First Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-09 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Russ (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Ivester | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |