OK SB527 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB527
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; creating the Oklahoma Prosperity Act Trust; requiring State Treasurer to develop certain trusts and IRAs established under program. Effective date.
Title
Public finance; creating the Oklahoma Prosperity Act Trust; requiring State Treasurer to develop certain trusts and IRAs established under program. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | coauthored by Pae |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Thompson |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Montgomery |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB527 (Carry Over) 2021-03-03 - Title stricken