OK SB524 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB524
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - coauthored by Martin (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - coauthored by Martin (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crime and punishment; making certain acts unlawful; providing penalties. Effective date.
Title
Crime and punishment; making certain acts unlawful; providing penalties. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | coauthored by Martin (principal House author) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB524 (Carry Over) 2017-02-13 - coauthored by Martin (principal House author)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 4 | 102 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 4 | 103 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb524&Session=1700 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB524%20INT.PDF |