OK SB519 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB519

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Banking and Business
Pending: House Banking and Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System; authorizing annual retirement for certain members with service-connected disability. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System; authorizing annual retirement for certain members with service-connected disability. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Banking and Business
2018-03-15HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-15SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2018-03-14SenateEmergency added
2018-03-14SenateTitle restored
2018-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2018-02-19SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-19SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2018-02-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-02-19SenateRemove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Senator Quinn
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108
2017-02-15SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB519 (Carry Over) 2017-04-04 - Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
472305New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback