OK SB517 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB517
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - Coauthored by Senator Boren
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - Coauthored by Senator Boren
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Electric utilities; creating the Wildland Fire Protection Act. Effective date.
Title
Electric utilities; creating the Wildland Fire Protection Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Newhouse [R] | Sen. Mary Boren [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newhouse |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB517 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Coauthored by Senator Boren