OK SB517 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Tax credits, exemptions and deductions; limiting time period during which various tax relief provisions may be claimed. Effective date.
Title
Tax credits, exemptions and deductions; limiting time period during which various tax relief provisions may be claimed. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2011-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Dank (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Mazzei | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27A | 2 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 2357 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 81 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2358 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 2358 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2370 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 5011 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 54006 | New Code | See Bill Text |