OK SB514 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB514

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; creating a task force to study and make recommendations on school district operations. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; creating a task force to study and make recommendations on school district operations. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 34 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenateApproved by Governor 05/10/2017
2017-05-04SenateSent to Governor
2017-05-04HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-05-04SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-05-03SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-05-03SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2017-05-03SenateHAs adopted
2017-04-19SenateHAs read
2017-04-19HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-18HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-18HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1
2017-04-18HouseMotion to suspend rule failed
2017-04-18HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-11HouseEmergency added
2017-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2017-03-23HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-23SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 4
2017-03-22SenateTitle restored
2017-03-22SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Casey (principal House author)
2017-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-27SenateEmergency removed
2017-02-27SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2017-02-22SenateCoauthored by Senator Loveless
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Stanislawski
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB514 (Carry Over) 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
701210285New CodeSee Bill Text
705107CAmended CodeSee Bill Text
707207Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb514&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB514%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB514%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB514%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB514%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB514%20ENR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB514%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB514%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB514%20SFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB514_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB514_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback